judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09799-CV
06-89-09799-CV
08/23/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Ghio, III, Bernard J.
City of Texarkana, Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/24/1990Mandate Issued
04/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/06/1990Submitted
03/06/1990Submission
02/06/1990Submission
01/31/1990Case ready to be set
01/31/1990Brief Filed
01/31/1990Request for Oral Argument
01/22/1990Request for Oral Argument
01/22/1990Brief Filed
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/23/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/23/1989Transcript Filed
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
5th District Court
Bowie
Honorable Jack Ellison Carter
86 C 938-5