judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-89-00206-CV
09-89-00206-CV
08/24/1989
Workers Compensation
Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company
Potter, Kenneth
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/13/1991Mandate Issued
08/02/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/19/1991Petition for WritMotion or Writ Denied
05/28/1991Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
05/07/1991Petition for Writ
04/11/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/05/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/21/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/29/1990Submitted
11/29/1990Submission
10/19/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
08/02/1990Submission
02/08/1990Brief Filed
02/08/1990Case ready to be set
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/20/1989Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/1989Miscellaneous Motions
12/15/1989Brief Filed
11/16/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/15/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/13/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wausau Underwriters InsuranceAppellantScott Tessmer
Kenneth PotterAppelleeDuane T. Corley
Trial Court Information
284th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Olen Underwood
87-07-2385CV