judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00345-CV
13-89-00345-CV
08/24/1989
Unknown Civil Case Type.
The State of Texas
Euresti, Rosalva, a/k/a Sylvia Lopez and Maria Luisa Bocaneg
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1991Cite for opinions
10/26/1990Mandate Issued
09/27/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/13/1990Submitted
06/13/1990Submission
05/22/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
05/22/1990Submission
04/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
04/16/1990Submission
11/06/1989List of Authorities
10/31/1989No oral argument requested
10/31/1989Brief Does not Comply
10/31/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Oral argument requested
10/02/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/24/1989Transcript Filed
08/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Of TexasAppellantOscar Ponce
Euresti, Et Al.AppelleeHon. E. Dale Robertson
Trial Court Information
Honorable Ronald Yeager