judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1214-89
PD-1214-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
THOMAS, ANTHONY RAY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/08/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateWilliam R. Turner
Thomas, Anthony RayApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)William W. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
10-88-00193-CR
Aff 8-3-89
10th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable JOHN DELANEY
14,148