judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00879-CV
01-89-00879-CV
08/31/1989
Original proceeding for writ of habeas corpus (Gov't 22.221(d))
Lynch, John Douglas Ex Parte
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/01/1989Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/16/1989Opinion issuedGrant motion
11/16/1989Opinion issuedGrant motion
10/10/1989Submitted
10/10/1989Submission
10/10/1989Submitted
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/30/1989Motion for leave to file
08/30/1989Order entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/01/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRelatorEdward A. Davis, III
StateRespondentPatsy Young
Trial Court Information
309th District Court
Harris
1,044,474