judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00881-CV
01-89-00881-CV
08/31/1989
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Owens, George W., as Executor of the Estate of Polly Owens
Hon. Louis M. Moore, Judge 281st District Court
Yes
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/1989Date final opinion release for publication
10/14/1989No petition for review or writ of error was filed
09/29/1989Motion for rehearing was not filed
09/14/1989Opinion issuedOverruled
09/14/1989Opinion issuedOverruled
08/31/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
08/31/1989Exhibits filed
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/14/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRelatorJohn M. Pinckney, III
StateRespondentWilliam D. Wood
Trial Court Information
281st District Court
Harris