judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00230-CR
07-89-00230-CR
07/05/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Texas, State of
Lauderdale, Nonnie
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/18/1990Mandate Issued
11/28/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1989Submitted
10/03/1989Submission
09/26/1989Motion Requesting Oral Argument DisposedGRANT
09/15/1989Motion Requesting Oral Argument Filed
09/08/1989Submission
08/07/1989Case ready to be set
08/07/1989Brief Filed
07/24/1989Brief Filed
07/24/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
07/05/1989Letter of Inquiry filed
07/05/1989Do not use
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/18/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Cecil G. Puryear
85-402,643