judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00362-CV
04-89-00362-CV
07/26/1989
Summary Judgment
Marilyn Mary Garrity Adams
Wilbur Lee Adams
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
04/11/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/11/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/03/1990Submitted
01/03/1990Submission
01/03/1990Submitted
11/27/1989Submission
08/11/1989Requests Oral Argument
08/11/1989Brief Filed
08/11/1989Case ready to be set
08/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/31/1989Brief Filed
07/31/1989Requests Oral Argument
07/26/1989No Description Available.
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/27/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/12/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Rose Spector
88-CI-19294
n/a