judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00789-CV
05-89-00789-CV
07/05/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Barrientos, John & Sophie Barrientos, Indv. & a/n/f of Steve
Matushita Electric Corporation of America, d/b/a Panasonic C
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/27/1997Record RetentionDestroy
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
12/17/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
09/19/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/19/1990MattConv
08/21/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/09/1990Response to Motion
08/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/19/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/02/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
05/02/1990Submitted
03/15/1990MattConv
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
12/18/1989Brief Filed
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
11/21/1989Brief Filed
10/31/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Response to Motion
10/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Exhibits Filed
09/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/31/1989MattConv
07/20/1989Transcript Filed
07/19/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/17/1989Response to Motion
07/05/1989MattConv
07/05/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/26/1989Appeal Bond Filed
03/28/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Harlan A Martin
87-11594-K