judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00277-CR
08-89-00277-CR
07/26/1989
Burglary
Strambler, Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/14/1990Shuck purged
05/31/1990Mandate Issued
05/31/1990Mandate Issued
02/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/26/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Submission
01/26/1990Submitted
12/01/1989Submission
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/13/1989Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
10/24/1989Brief Filed
10/24/1989Payment of fee due requested
10/11/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/23/1989Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
08/23/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/21/1989Transcript Filed
07/26/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Al W. Schorre, Jr.
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Jack Chappell
Trial Court Information
238th District Court
Midland
Honorable Vann Culp
CRB-15,644
25 yrs. TDC