judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00635-CV
14-89-00635-CV
07/10/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Delaney, James F.
Burns International Security Services, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/10/1989Mandate Issued
08/10/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
08/10/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/10/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/10/1989Mandate Issued
08/01/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
07/10/1989Transcript FILED
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/12/1989Motion for new trial FILED
03/13/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeSteve D. Statham
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Douglas J. Brooks
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Julia J. Knight
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable DON WITTIG
83-28847