judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00328-CV
04-89-00328-CV
07/10/1989
Summary Judgment
Homero Yzaguirre
Benito Medrano & John F. Ryan
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2020Fee paid
05/24/1990Mandate Issued
05/24/1990Mandate Issued
03/29/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/1990Response to Motion Filed
03/15/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/17/1990Submitted
01/17/1990Submission
01/17/1990Submitted
12/08/1989Submission
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/12/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/01/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/01/1989Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1989Motion for Leave Filed
08/21/1989Amended Brief Received
08/16/1989Brief Filed
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/14/1989Order Entered
07/28/1989No Description Available.
07/24/1989Response to Motion Filed
07/20/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/14/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/13/1989Show cause hearing held
07/10/1989No Description Available.
07/10/1989No Description Available.
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/26/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Zapata
Honorable Manuel R. Flores
2,456
n/a