judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00169-CR
11-89-00169-CR
07/10/1989
Extradition
Staggs, Ex parte Mason Lee
-
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/1989Mandate issued
08/03/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1989Opinion issued
08/03/1989Submitted
08/03/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/31/1989Case ready to be set
07/31/1989Brief filed
07/20/1989Brief filed
07/14/1989Supp. TR filed
07/12/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/12/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/10/1989Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
350th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Jorge A. Solis
1327-D