judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8089
A-8089
10/24/1960
Application for Writ of Error
L. A. FREYTAG, ET AL.
DORA CAIN JOHNSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/02/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/02/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/16/1961Response to Reply filedPetitioner
12/30/1960Response to Reply filedRespondent
12/21/1960Response to Reply filedPetitioner
12/08/1960Response to Reply filedRespondent
11/28/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/08/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
10/24/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/14/1961Response to Motion filed
02/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/16/1961Response to Reply filed
12/30/1960Response to Reply filed
12/21/1960Response to Reply filed
12/08/1960Response to Reply filed
11/28/1960Reply to Response
11/08/1960Response to Petition
10/24/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/24/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L. A. Freytag, et al.Petitioner
Dora Cain JohnsonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information