judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8128
A-8128
11/30/1960
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
ESTHER LEWIS WEMSKE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/14/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/30/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/1961Response to Motion filed
07/26/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/12/1961Opinion issued
03/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
12/14/1960Response to Petition
11/30/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/30/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Esther Lewis WemskeRespondent
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information