judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8214
A-8214
01/27/1961
Application for Writ of Error
J. C. BOX
DON BATES AND R. F. BATES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/06/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
01/27/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/10/1961Opinion issued
03/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1961Reply to Response
02/06/1961Response to Petition
01/27/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/27/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. C. BoxPetitioner
Don Bates and R. F. BatesRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information