judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8201
A-8201
01/20/1961
Application for Writ of Error
S. C. WILSON, ET AL.
GRAND INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, T. H. BENDY AND L. E. CROFT, CHICAGO, ROCK ISLAND AND PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, AND FORT WORTH AND DENVER RAILWAY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/27/1961Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
02/14/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/03/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
01/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/27/1961Supplement to Petition filed
02/14/1961Response to Petition
02/03/1961Response to Petition
01/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/20/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S. C. Wilson, et al.Petitioner
Grand International Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers, T. H. Bendy and L. E. CroftRespondent
Chicago, Rock Island and Pacific Railroad Company, and Fort Worth and Denver Railway CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information