judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8057
A-8057
09/30/1960
Application for Writ of Error
MAX REDBURN, ADMINSTRATOR OF THE ESTATES OF JAMES E. REDBURN AND EDITH H. REDBURN, DECEASED, ROBERT H. REDBURN, CLARE DEAN REDBURN, BETTY JO GADDY, JOINED BY HER HUSBAND, JOSEPH H. GADDY
FRED W. SHIELD, H. A. DE COMPIEGNE, O. F. SPEAS, JR. AND FRED W. SHIELD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/01/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/14/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
10/13/1960Response to PetitionPetitioner
09/30/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/06/1961Response to Motion filed
02/01/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/14/1960Response to Petition
10/13/1960Response to Petition
09/30/1960Conditional application for writ of error filedDismissed
09/30/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/30/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. A. De Compiegne, O. F. Speas, Jr. and Fred W. ShieldRespondent
Fred W. ShieldRespondent
Max Redburn, Adminstrator of the Estates of James E. Redburn and Edith H. Redburn, deceased, Robert H. Redburn, Clare Dean Redburn, Betty Jo Gaddy, joined by her husband, Joseph H. GaddyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information