judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8029
A-8029
08/29/1960
Application for Writ of Error
SELMA LEAF NOVY, EARL PODOLNICK, ET AL.
MARY JANE HAMILTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/16/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
08/29/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/12/1961Opinion issued
01/11/1961Document received (See Remarks)
09/30/1960Motion to Substitute filed
09/16/1960Response to Petition
08/29/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/29/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Selma Leaf NovyPetitioner
Mary Jane HamiltonRespondent
Earl Podolnick, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information