judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8150
A-8150
12/20/1960
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/20/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/11/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/30/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
12/20/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/30/1961Letter Filed
02/20/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/06/1961Opinion issued
01/11/1961Reply to Response
12/30/1960Response to Petition
12/20/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/20/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATIONRespondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information