judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00240-CV
08-89-00240-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
McClendon, Albert
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.& Robert F. Hyatt
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/03/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/12/1991Mandate Issued
02/12/1991Shuck purged
02/12/1991Mandate Issued
01/23/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
01/23/1991Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
11/02/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/23/1990Application for Writ of Error
10/23/1990Fee paid
10/10/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/03/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
09/26/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
09/13/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/05/1990Motion - extend time to file a MFR - DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1990Motion - extend time to file MFR - Filed
08/20/1990Fee paid
08/13/1990Fee paid
08/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/01/1990Payment of fee due requested
08/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/26/1990Submitted
06/26/1990Submission
06/26/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
01/29/1990Miscellaneous filing
11/08/1989Brief Filed
11/08/1989Case ready to be set
11/08/1989Case ready to be set
10/25/1989Brief Filed
10/25/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
10/18/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Order entered
10/13/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/11/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
10/06/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/13/1989Brief Filed
08/09/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1989Order entered
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/18/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/03/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon Ruben Hope, Jr.
UnknownAppelleeHon. James Boanerges
UnknownAppelleeHon. David E. Lueders
UnknownAppellantHon. Isaac E. Henderson
UnknownAppelleeHon. W. Scott Goleman
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
88-51254