judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00244-CV
08-89-00244-CV
07/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Cronen, Charles D.
Brawner, Charles and The Metroplex Paper & Supply Company
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/06/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/11/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
04/11/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
01/03/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/20/1989Application for Writ of Error
11/16/1989Miscellaneous filing
10/11/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/28/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/27/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/13/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
09/13/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
09/13/1989Submission
09/13/1989Submitted
09/13/1989Case ready to be set
08/09/1989Motion - Extension time to file bond dispMotion or Writ Granted
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/06/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Debra Catlett
UnknownAppellantCharles D. Cronen
UnknownAppelleeHon. Robert S. Weinberg
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
83-39347