judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00267-CR
08-89-00267-CR
07/25/1989
All Misdemeanors
Snelson, Philip Craig
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/13/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/1989Shuck purged
11/01/1989Mandate Issued
11/01/1989Mandate Issued
08/30/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
08/30/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
08/30/1989Submission
08/30/1989Submitted
08/30/1989Case ready to be set
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Charles Rice Young
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Gilbert Douglas
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 3
Harris
4456
$750.00