judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00271-CV
08-89-00271-CV
07/25/1989
Contract
Shields, Michael E. and Debra L. Shields
Atlantic Financial Mortgage Corporation
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/14/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/08/1998Fee paid
05/26/1992Fee paid
09/18/1991Fee paid
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
01/14/1991Shuck purged
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
11/19/1990Fee paid
11/08/1990Fee paid
10/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1990Submitted
10/03/1990Submission
10/03/1990Submitted
09/28/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/28/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/05/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/20/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
08/10/1990Submission
05/11/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/1990Order entered
05/09/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
05/02/1990Submission
04/18/1990Supplemental Transcript Filed
04/04/1990Order entered
10/10/1989Fee paid
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Miscellaneous filing
09/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/20/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Order entered
09/06/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/14/1989Brief Filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/14/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeBarbara Burnett
UnknownAppelleeHon. Joe G. Roady
UnknownAppellantHon. Herbert W. Fortson, III
UnknownAppelleeHon. Mary Ann A. Bellatti
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
87-49492