judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00879-CR
05-89-00879-CR
07/25/1989
Other Drug Possession
Jones, Cleveland Elgin
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/2020Order enteredDestroy
01/08/1991Mandate Issued
01/08/1991Mandate Issued
12/20/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/04/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
08/02/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/23/1990Response to Motion
07/10/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/28/1990Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/27/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
06/12/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
03/12/1990MattConv
01/16/1990Brief Filed
01/16/1990Case ready to be set
01/16/1990Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/19/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/02/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/09/1989Brief Filed
09/01/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/09/1989Transcript Filed
08/03/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/15/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
06/15/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/13/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F89-70153-RL
5 years TDC, $300 Fine