judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00263-CR
08-89-00263-CR
07/25/1989
All Misdemeanors
Folami, Ken
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/13/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/13/1990Shuck purged
04/13/1990Mandate Issued
04/13/1990Mandate Issued
02/12/1990Fee paid
01/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/08/1990Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
01/03/1990Payment of fee due requested
12/27/1989Brief Filed
12/15/1989Miscellaneous filing
12/15/1989Submitted
12/15/1989Submission
12/15/1989Submitted
12/07/1989Order entered
10/31/1989Submission
07/25/1989Case ready to be set
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case ready to be set
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Charles Rice Young
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Gilbert Douglas
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 10
Harris
4566
$750.00