judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00253-CR
08-89-00253-CR
07/25/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Fulmer, Dale Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/10/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/27/1990Shuck purged
12/21/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Granted
10/08/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
08/29/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/16/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/01/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/01/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/28/1990Submitted
06/28/1990Submission
06/28/1990Submitted
05/09/1990Brief Filed
05/09/1990Case ready to be set
05/09/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/1990Case ready to be set
05/03/1990Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
05/02/1990Submission
04/23/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/28/1990Brief Filed
03/21/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/14/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/1990Order entered
01/31/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/20/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/04/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Order entered
09/21/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
09/18/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
09/11/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/25/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. John B. Holmes
UnknownCriminal - AppellantMr. Dale W. Fulmer
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Roger Bridgewater
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Rosemary Garza
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
504,326
16 yrs TDC + $2,000. fine