judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals

Case: 03-89-00153-CR
03-89-00153-CR
07/07/1989
Other Felony
Jack A. Gant, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/23/1993CASE STORED
09/26/1991Mandate Issued
07/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/23/1991Exhibits filed
01/09/1991miscellaneous motion dispMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1990Brief filed
12/13/1990Case ready to be set
12/13/1990miscellaneous motion filed
11/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1990Order Entered
11/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/15/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/14/1990Contempt fine paid criminal
09/14/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/12/1990Order Entered
09/05/1990Submitted
08/20/1990Brief filed
07/11/1990Order Entered
07/11/1990Submission
05/02/1990Order Entered
04/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/26/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/26/1990Statement of Facts Filed
01/24/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/17/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
11/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/06/1989Transcript Filed
10/25/1989Order Entered
09/18/1989Transcript Received
07/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/26/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHonorable Daniel Williams
Gant, Jr., Jack A.AppellantMr. James E. Anderson
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable Thomas Blackwell
88,667
2 yrs