judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6424
B-6424
12/03/1976
Application for Writ of Error
DELMAN E. WINDHORST, DBA TRI-WAY WATER SUPPLY AND WINDYS WATER WORKS
ADCOCK PIPE AND SUPPLY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/23/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/03/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/22/1977Response to Motion filed
02/14/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/26/1977Opinion issued
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
12/23/1976Response to Petition
12/10/1976Response to Motion filed
12/06/1976Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
12/03/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/03/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Delman E. Windhorst, dba Tri-Way Water Supply and Windys Water WorksPetitioner
Adcock Pipe and SupplyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information