judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6123
B-6123
07/02/1976
Application for Writ of Error
RALPH G. TEMPLETON
UNIGARD SECURITY INSURANCE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/13/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/11/1976Supplement to ResponseRespondent
07/15/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
07/02/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/18/1977Response to Motion filed
01/13/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/31/1976Opinion issued
11/11/1976Supplement to Response
09/29/1976Document received (See Remarks)
07/15/1976Response to Petition
07/02/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/02/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ralph G. TempletonPetitioner
Unigard Security InsuranceRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information