judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9032
C-9032
09/07/1989
App Writ of Error
JAY W. COUNTS ET AL.
TEXAS INDEPENDENT BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/22/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/07/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/07/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
11/15/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
10/05/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/05/1989No description available.
09/22/1989Reply to Response
09/07/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/07/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
RONNY E. DAYPetitionerMr. J. Terry Weeks
WILLIAM K. KNOXPetitionerMr. J. Terry Weeks
LEE ROY BAUMANPetitionerMr. J. Terry Weeks
DAVID T. DAVENPORTPetitionerMr. J. Terry Weeks
CLYDE A. HUDSONPetitionerMr. J. Terry Weeks
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00212-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 06-14-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable J. WOODFIN JONES
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable James R. Meyers
435,119