judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00831-CR
14-89-00831-CR
09/07/1989
Auto Theft
Citizen, Mark Anthony
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/1990Case stored
11/13/1990Mandate Issued
11/13/1990Mandate Issued
11/09/1990No description available.
10/29/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
10/12/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
09/27/1990Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STADENIED
09/27/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/27/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/26/1990Submitted
09/26/1990Submission
09/26/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Hearing Record FILED
05/25/1990Hearing Record FILED
04/12/1990Order Entered
04/12/1990Order Entered
01/16/1990No description available.
10/31/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
10/31/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
10/31/1989Transcript FILED
09/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/01/1989Date of Sentence
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Warnell Williams
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
510,600
2 years TDC