judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00805-CR
14-89-00805-CR
08/29/1989
Other Drug Possession
Shorter, Ramon Larot
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/01/1990Case stored
02/15/1990Mandate Issued
02/15/1990Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/15/1990Mandate Issued
02/14/1990Submitted
02/14/1990Submission
02/14/1990Submitted
02/08/1990Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
02/08/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
02/08/1990Transcript FILED
02/07/1990Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
01/25/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/30/1989Transcript received only; mtn. pending
10/13/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
08/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/28/1989Date of Sentence
08/28/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/01/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantReo Harris, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
522,612
7 yrs. TDC Prob./$1000