Case: 05-23-00456-CV
05-23-00456-CV
05/15/2023
Mandamus
In Re: 1 Coventry Court, LLC, Moshe Feldhendler, and Leah Feldhendler
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/13/2023 | Original Proceeding response filed | Real party in interest |
| ||||
05/15/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
10/13/2023 | Original Proceeding response filed |
| |||||
08/14/2023 | Response due | | |||||
07/18/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
07/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||
06/30/2023 | Response due | | |||||
06/13/2023 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
06/05/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
05/26/2023 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
05/16/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
05/15/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/09/2024 | Submission | Briefs |
05/16/2023 | Original Proceedings | Original proceeding |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The Downs of Hillcrest Residential Association, Inc. | Real party in interest | Emileigh S. Hubbard Michael G. Oddo |
1 Coventry Court, LLC, Moshe Feldhendler, and Leah Feldhendler | Relator | Lawrence T. Bowman Eva M. Brown Lindsey M. Rames |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Eric V. Moyé
DC-21-01541
Diane L. Robert