judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCCARTNEY (DONNA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53467
Short Caption:MCCARTNEY (DONNA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 53306
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228670 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/24/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 09-07448
03/24/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/12/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Appellant McCartney Due date: 10 days. 09-11727
05/27/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-13091
06/01/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 11, 2009. 09-13563
06/17/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-14975
06/18/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due July 13, 2009. 09-15262
07/16/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 09-17508
07/23/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). 09-18053
08/04/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 2. 09-19018
08/07/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. in part. Fast Track Statement due 15 days. 09-19273
08/28/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 09-21052
09/17/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 09-22502
09/18/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 09-22763
02/03/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. 10-03048
03/02/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-04388
03/02/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. 10-04388