judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CROSBY (LAMAR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49491
Short Caption:CROSBY (LAMAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C163503Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/10/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/21/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/21/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-11176
06/06/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-12311
08/10/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 07-17699
08/10/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/07/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD 07-19765
10/02/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-19819
10/02/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/12/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2007. 07-19819