judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GIBSON (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51351
Short Caption:GIBSON (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP06206Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/24/2008How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/31/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/31/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-07906
03/31/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. Filed in district court on: March 27, 2008. 08-07908
04/07/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/15-1/18/08 and 3/10/08. To Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 08-08562
04/07/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondent's Supplemental Request. Transcripts requested: January 15-18, 2008. To Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 08-08693
04/14/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-09220
05/09/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-11664
05/15/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. Court Reporter Lisa Manley's certificate of delivery due: June 16, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-12188
07/10/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Ms. Manley shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, pay the sum of $250.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. However, this sanction shall be automatically vacated if Ms. Manley files and serves the certificate of delivery or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within ten days from the date of this order. 08-17556
07/16/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Manley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/15/08 through 1/17/08. 08-18313
07/28/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-19453
07/28/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-19454
08/18/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-21268
08/18/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 08-21269
08/18/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion by Respondent for an Order Requiring the Clerk of the District Court to Provide a Copy of the Pre-Sentence Report to This Court. 08-21270
08/29/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, certify and transmit appellant's pre-sentence report in case number CRFP06206, along with the psycho-sexual report and evaluation and appellant's 22-page handwritten letter , to the clerk of this court, in a sealed envelope, for filing and consideration with the appendix. 08-22333
09/05/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. SEALED - Pre-Sentence Investigation Report, Psycho-sexual Evaluation, and Appellant's 22 page handwritten letter. 08-22935
09/26/2008Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief filed.
10/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 08-27297
10/24/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/03/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-30684
12/30/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-31193
12/30/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/07/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 2, 2009. 08-31193