Case: 09-23-00213-CR
09-23-00213-CR
07/05/2023
Indecency with a Child
Patrick Calvin Reilley
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/15/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/15/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/17/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/17/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/20/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/22/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/23/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/23/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
09/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
09/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/22/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
07/27/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
07/11/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
07/05/2023 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
07/05/2023 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/21/2024 | Status | State brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Reilley, Patrick Calvin | Criminal - Appellant | Darin J. Ray |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Amy Waddle Zayna Radwan |
Trial Court Information
9th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Phil Grant
22-01-00051-CR
Rebecca Lewis
15yrs and 6months TDCJ