Case: 13-24-00011-CV
13-24-00011-CV
01/04/2024
Divorce
In the Matter of the Marriage of Erica Edith Alonzo and Jose Manuel Figueroa and in the Interest of J.J.F., a Child
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/2024 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||||||
02/01/2024 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||||||
02/01/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
02/01/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
02/01/2024 | Submitted | | |||||||
01/23/2024 | Fee paid | | |||||||
01/23/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal received |
| |||||||
01/11/2024 | Fee paid | | |||||||
01/11/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal received | | |||||||
01/11/2024 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
01/11/2024 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||||
01/11/2024 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||||
01/11/2024 | Fee paid | | |||||||
01/11/2024 | Amended notice of appeal filed | | |||||||
01/05/2024 | Notice of defect regarding perfection of the notice of appeal | | |||||||
01/04/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/04/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
10/13/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
09/14/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/16/2024 | Status | Mandate to Issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Alonzo, Erica Edith | Appellee | Hon. Roberto Rene Garcia |
Marco Chacon Fernandez Heirs of the Estate of Jose Manuel Figueora, Deceased | Appellant | Hon. Aissa I. Garza |
D'Yave Figueroa Espin Heirs of the Estate of Jose Manuel Figueora, Deceased | Appellant | Hon. Aissa I. Garza |
Joana Marcelia Figueroa Heirs of the Estate of Jose Manuel Figueora, Deceased | Appellant | Hon. Aissa I. Garza |
Jose Manuel Figueroa Heirs of the Estate of Jose Manuel Figueora, Deceased | Appellant | Hon. Aissa I. Garza |
Claudia Alina Espin Villalobos Heirs of the Estate of Jose Manuel Figueora, Deceased | Appellant | Hon. Aissa I. Garza |
Zarelea Figueroa Heirs of the Estate of Jose Manuel Figueora, Deceased | Appellant | Hon. Aissa I. Garza |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Hidalgo
Honorable Jaime Palacios
F-488-06-02
Adelaido Flores