judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5889
A-5889
06/07/1956
Application for Writ of Error
CLAUDE BATEMAN, JR., ET AL.
CARTER-JONES DRILLING COMPANY AND BLUFORD STINCHCOMB, FEDERAL LAND BANK OF HOUSTON, CARTER-JONES DRILLING COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/07/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/26/1956Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/23/1956Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/20/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/16/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
06/15/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
06/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/07/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/26/1956Response to Brief filed
06/23/1956Response to Brief filed
06/20/1956Reply to Response
06/16/1956Response to Petition
06/15/1956Response to Petition
06/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/07/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carter-Jones Drilling Company, et al.Respondent
Claude Bateman, Jr., et al.Petitioner
Carter-Jones Drilling Company and Bluford StinchcombRespondent
Federal Land Bank of HoustonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information