judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3555
B-3555
08/28/1972
Application for Writ of Error
CITADEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
CHESTER SMITH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1973Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/27/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/05/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/20/1972Errata FiledRespondent
09/20/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1973Reply to Response
04/27/1973Reply to Response
04/09/1973Response to Motion filed
03/05/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/20/1972Errata Filed
09/20/1972Response to Petition
08/28/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/28/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chester Smith, et al.Respondent
Citadel Construction Company, Inc., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information