judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00143-CR
08-82-00143-CR
05/14/1982
Burglary
Godwin, Carl Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
12/16/1983Mandate Issued
11/30/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
11/30/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewRefused
07/08/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/30/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/01/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/18/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/18/1983Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/05/1983Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty filed
04/20/1983Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/08/1983No description available.
03/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/29/1982Submitted
10/06/1982Submission
07/07/1982Brief Filed
06/07/1982Brief Filed
05/13/1982Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
41st District Court
El Paso
36409
10 Years