judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANGELO (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47960
Short Caption:ANGELO (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39047 , 44388 , 56558 , 58682
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5632Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/14/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/30/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-18071
09/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-19094
11/14/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-23316
11/14/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-00537
02/02/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-01999
02/02/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/08/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2007. 07-01999