judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5302
B-5302
05/13/1975
Application for Writ of Error
C. T. LATHAM, ET UX.
CHARLES BEN HOWELL, DURWOOD O. PHILLIPS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/04/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/25/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/15/1975Letter brief Respondent
06/30/1975Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/23/1975Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/10/1975Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
06/05/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/16/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
05/16/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
05/13/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/04/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/25/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/15/1975Letter brief
06/30/1975Reply to Response
06/23/1975Response to Petition
06/10/1975Brief in Support of Petition
06/05/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/16/1975Response to Petition
05/16/1975Response to Petition
05/13/1975Document received (See Remarks)
05/13/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles Ben HowellRespondent
C. T. Latham, et ux.Petitioner
Durwood O. PhillipsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information