judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Laura Perilla-Vargas v. Baylor College of Medicine, Shafeeq Sheikh, M.D.

Case: 01-17-00018-CV
01-17-00018-CV
01/06/2017
Malpractice
Laura Perilla-Vargas
Baylor College of Medicine, Shafeeq Sheikh, M.D.
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
06/29/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/29/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/28/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
08/02/2019Mandate issued
07/25/2019Case returned from higher court
06/14/2019Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtSC denies petition for review
11/29/2018Case forwarded to higher court
06/25/2018Notice received
06/25/2018Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
06/25/2018Petition for review due in Supreme Court
05/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
04/25/2018Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/25/2018Motion for rehearing due
04/10/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment
04/10/2018Judgment Issued
01/10/2018Submitted
12/06/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
07/19/2017Reply brief due
06/29/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/29/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/29/2017Case ready to be set
06/29/2017Appellees brief due
06/01/2017Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/2017Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/30/2017Appellees brief due
05/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/05/2017Letter filed
04/28/2017Motion to dismiss filed
04/28/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested
04/28/2017Appellants brief due
04/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/14/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/14/2017Appellants brief due
03/15/2017Appellants brief due
03/13/2017Response due
03/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/07/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/28/2017Amended notice of appeal filed
02/28/2017Response filed
02/13/2017Clerks record filed
02/10/2017Court reporters information sheet sent
02/09/2017No reporters record filed in civil case
02/09/2017No clerks record filed in civil case
02/07/2017Record due
01/31/2017Response filed
01/27/2017Motion to dismiss filed
01/26/2017Court fee due
01/26/2017Docketing statement due
01/09/2017Docketing statement filed
01/09/2017Fee paid
01/06/2017Case began in court of appeals
01/06/2017Notice of appeal received
01/05/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court
12/09/2016Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/02/2019Case StoredCase stored
08/02/2025RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harris County Hospital District d/b/a Harris Health System, d/b/a Ben Taub General Hospital AppelleeEbon Holt Swofford
Laura Perilla-VargasAppellantShannon Kathleen Dunn  
Stephanie De Sola
Beth Watkins  
Baylor College of MedicineAppelleeJeffrey B. McClure
Shafeeq Sheikh, M.D.AppelleeMatthew Halpin
Elizabeth Burrus
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 80th District Court
2015-62240
Court Reporter 80th District Court