judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-94-00058-CR
06-94-00058-CR
02/22/1994
Other Drug Delivery
Mitchell, Willie Ray
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/1997Mandate Issued
11/08/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/28/1996Case ready to be set
10/28/1996Case reinstated
10/28/1996Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/28/1996Case remanded from higher court
10/25/1996Mandate Issued
10/02/1996Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/24/1995Submission
05/03/1995Petition for Discretionary Review FiledMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/22/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
01/24/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/18/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/05/1995Motion DisposedOverruled
01/05/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/05/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/18/1994Submitted
10/18/1994Submission
09/15/1994Submission
08/19/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/16/1994Brief Filed
08/16/1994Case ready to be set
08/16/1994Request for Oral Argument
08/16/1994Holding for Record
08/12/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/09/1994Motion DisposedOrdered carried with the case
07/25/1994MOTION
07/18/1994Brief Filed
07/18/1994Request for Oral Argument
06/22/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/20/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/24/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/17/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/22/1994Transcript Filed
02/22/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mitchell, Willie RayAppellantHon. Dan K. Parchman
Trial Court Information
8th District Court
Franklin
6665
77 Yrs. TDC