judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BACON VS. SAYRE

Case Information: 47935
Short Caption:BACON VS. SAYRECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A511457Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/08/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 06-17867
09/12/2006BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 06-18792
09/12/2006Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 06-18793
09/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A511457: 120 days. 06-19032
12/08/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-25153
12/08/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We deny Bacon's September 12, 2006 transcript request.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-03280
02/26/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Reconsideration En Banc. 07-04581
04/05/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c).] fn2[Although the petition was styled a "Petition for Reconsideration En Banc," we construe it as a petition for rehearing.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-07599
05/01/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-08362
05/01/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 3, 2007. 07-08362