judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLARK VS. CLARK

Case Information: 46000
Short Caption:CLARK VS. CLARKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0402085Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/26/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-19059
10/03/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. 05-19601
10/12/2005Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: June 2, 2005. Court Reporter: Second J.D.C., Family Division, Dept. 2. 05-20207
10/12/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-20209
11/10/2005Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Regarding Waiver of Fees and Costs filed in district court on November 8, 2005. 05-22244
11/16/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn4[In light of this order, appellant's request for transcripts is denied as moot.] NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-22525
12/13/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-23361
12/13/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/21/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 15, 2005. 05-23361