judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HRALIMA (MAIGA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47928
Short Caption:HRALIMA (MAIGA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41920 , 46645 , 46847 , 47213 , 49345 , 50263 , 50718 , 50719 , 56965 , 57894
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR021574Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/11/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17842
10/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-20495
12/11/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 06-25263
12/11/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We have reviewed all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-02795
02/26/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Request filed on 2/15/07. 07-04479
03/02/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04409
03/02/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/15/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2007. 07-04409