judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SLACK (LEONARD) VS. STATE C/W 45812

Case Information: 45998
Short Caption:SLACK (LEONARD) VS. STATE C/W 45812Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 45812 *, 45998Related Case(s): 45812
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C208168Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-19007
09/23/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/22/05, 3/29/05, 5/31/05, 6/3/05, 6/6/05, 6/7/05, 7/18/05**, 7/28/05 and 8/4/05. Court Reporters: Sherry Graham, Kit MacDonald, Cheryl Gardner, Renee Silvaggio and Norma Silverman. Filed in district court on: September 20, 2005. **Per letter from Norma Jean Silverman: the date of 07/18/05 is incorrect--the correct date should be 07/14/05.jcr 05-19008
09/30/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Consolidation of Appeal and for Extension of Time. Nos. 45812/45998. 05-19501
10/11/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Mondlay, June 6, 2005; Tuesday, June 7, 2005; Thursday, July 14, 2005; Thursday, July 28, 2005; Thursday, August 4, 2005. Court Reporter: Norma Jean Silverman. 05-20040
10/17/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. These appeals are hereby consolidated. Fast track statement and appendix due: 30 days. Nos. 45812/45998. (05-20413)
10/21/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Tuesday, May 31, 2005. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. Nos. 45812/45998. (05-20947)
11/02/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 3, 2005. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. Nos. 45812/45998. (05-21640)
11/21/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 45812/45998 (05-22953).
12/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for a 30-day extension to file the fast track statement. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days. Nos. 45812/45998. (05-23971)
12/12/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Slack's Motion for Leave to File 40 Page Fast Track Statement. Nos. 45812/45998 (05-24270).
12/12/2005Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. Nos. 45812/45998 (05-24271).
12/12/2005AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. Nos. 45812/45998 (05-24272).
12/27/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on December 1, 2005. Nos. 45812/45998. (05-25142)
12/27/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos. 45812/45998. (05-24271)
12/27/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Nos. 45812/45998. (05-24272)
01/06/2006MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Nos. 45812/45998 (06-00342).
01/06/2006Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Response. Nos. 45812/45998 (06-00343).
02/07/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track response provisionally submitted on January 6, 2006. Nos. 45812/45998. (06-02700)
02/07/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 45812/45998. (06-00343)
07/28/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for a new trial." Fn6 [Because we remand for a new trial, we note that Slack's remaining contention that the district court erred by dening his motion for a new trial is moot.] Parraguirre, J., dissenting: NNP06-MD/NB/RP Nos. 45812/45998. 06-15794
08/22/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-16637
08/22/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 24, 2006. 06-16637